A different way to multiply squares!
This is a quick trick for finding the square of two-digit numbers. For example, if you've got something like 33*33, that's a tough product to find.
To more easily find the product, just round one of the numbers to the nearest 10, to make the problem 30*33. Then, because you took away 3 from the first number, add 3 to the other number to make the problem 30*36. Then the multiplication problem is easier, because 30*36 can be found by multiplying 3*36 to get 108, and then adding back the 0 to get 1,080.
Then, because you changed each number by 3, add back 3^2=9 to that result, and you can then say that 33*33=1,089.
READY TO START WINNING AT MATH?
Our math courses will be the exact fix you’ve been so desperate for to help you pass your class so you can get on with your education, finish your degree with less stress, and have the career you’re dreaming of.